Update Report
As of: 3/27/2023 7:27:08 PM
Change made: March 27, 2023 2:22 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
March 30, 2023 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
HB0778
Mont Co Deleg and PG Co Deleg
Montgomery County - Bicounty Agencies - Commissioner Discipline, Disclosures, Training, and Ethics MC/PG 105-23
ADDED: 2:22 PM
HB1214
Del Stein
Residential Retail Electricity - Green Power - Renewable Energy Credits and Marketing Claims
ADDED: 2:22 PM
Change made: March 27, 2023 2:22 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
April 4, 2023 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
HB0967
Del Bhandari, et al
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Dashain Day
ADDED: 2:22 PM
Change made: March 27, 2023 3:37 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
March 28, 2023 1:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Change made: March 27, 2023 5:57 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment Subcommittee - Work Session
March 29, 2023 3:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Change made: March 27, 2023 11:57 AM - HEARING ADDED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Work Session
March 29, 2023 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Change made: March 27, 2023 11:53 AM - HEARING ADDED
Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee - Work Session
March 30, 2023 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Change made: March 27, 2023 11:56 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
March 30, 2023 3:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 30, 2023 2:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
Change made: March 27, 2023 4:36 PM - HEARING ADDED
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Work Session
March 28, 2023 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Change made: March 27, 2023 3:29 PM - HEARING ADDED
Accountability and Implementation Board Nominating Committee - Other
March 31, 2023 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
AIB Vacancy-Announcement of Nominees
Change made: March 27, 2023 11:07 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 4 - Baltimore County - Other
March 27, 2023 3:30 PM
Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
House Bills