Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 3/24/2023 12:26:10 PM
Friday, March 24, 2023
Friday, March 24, 2023
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: March 24, 2023 11:13 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
March 24, 2023 3:30 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0516
Sens Feldman and Hayes

Cannabis Reform

Change made: March 24, 2023 11:20 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
March 27, 2023 3:30 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0516
Sens Feldman and Hayes

Cannabis Reform

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: March 24, 2023 11:00 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
March 24, 2023 11:30 AM
(Previous Date/Time: March 24, 2023 12:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Judiciary Committee
Change made: March 24, 2023 10:47 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
March 24, 2023 11:30 AM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0772
The Spkr (Atty Gen Ofc)

Human Relations - Civil Rights Enforcement - Powers of the Attorney General

Other
Board of Public Works
Change made: March 24, 2023 10:06 AM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
July 5, 2023 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: March 24, 2023 11:16 AM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
July 19, 2023 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: March 24, 2023 11:19 AM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
August 2, 2023 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: March 24, 2023 11:22 AM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
August 23, 2023 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Click to return on the top page