Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/18/2022 10:33:50 AM
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
House
Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: January 18, 2022 10:23 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
January 18, 2022 2:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0129
Del Charkoudian

Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services and Public Safety Answering Points – Modifications
ADDED: 10:23 AM

Change made: January 18, 2022 10:23 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 1, 2022 2:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0227
Del Harrison

State Government – Legal and Employee Holiday – Juneteenth National Independence Day
ADDED: 10:23 AM
HB0276
Del Cullison

Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing Authority
ADDED: 10:23 AM

Change made: January 18, 2022 10:23 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 8, 2022 2:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0279
Del Rogers, et al

Veterans Affairs - Office of Communications and Public Affairs - Veterans Advocacy and Education Act
ADDED: 10:23 AM
HB0286
Del Kaiser

Emergency Medical Services - Paramedics - Immunization Administration - Effective Date
ADDED: 10:23 AM
HB0292
Del Davis

Occupational Licensing Boards and Commission on Judicial Disabilities - Reporting Disciplinary Activities
ADDED: 10:23 AM

Other
Board of Public Works
Change made: January 18, 2022 10:15 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Board of Public Works - Other
March 9, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting
REMOVED: 10:15 AM
General Meeting and Bond Sale
ADDED: 10:15 AM

Click to return on the top page