Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 9/28/2021 5:04:43 PM
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
Other
Maryland Orphans Courts, Task Force to Study
Change made: September 28, 2021 10:10 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Orphans Courts, Task Force to Study - Other
September 30, 2021 11:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
First meeting of the Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts.

Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority
Change made: September 28, 2021 4:41 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority - Other
October 6, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Open Meeting of the Full Authority + Closed Executive Session

OIS Testing
Change made: September 28, 2021 11:49 AM - HEARING ADDED
OIS Testing - Other
September 29, 2021 5:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Testing

Change made: September 28, 2021 11:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
OIS Testing - Other
September 30, 2021 6:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Testing
ADDED: 11:51 AM

Click to return on the top page