Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 3/1/2024 4:39:47 PM
Friday, March 1, 2024
Friday, March 1, 2024
Senate
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: March 1, 2024 11:13 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
March 1, 2024 4:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Finance Committee
Change made: March 1, 2024 1:02 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
March 7, 2024 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB1064
Cecil County Senators

Cecil County - Board of License Commissioners - Inspections of Licensed Cannabis Businesses
REMOVED: 1:02 PM

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: March 1, 2024 11:39 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
March 1, 2024 12:30 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: March 1, 2024 12:43 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
March 1, 2024 1:45 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 1, 2024 12:55 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 1, 2024 12:45 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Appropriations Committee - Budget Hearing
March 1, 2024 2:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 1, 2024 1:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Department of Budget and Management - Secretary
Department of Budget and Management - Personnel
Governor's Office of Children

Change made: March 1, 2024 11:55 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 7, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
HB1058
Del Young

Law Enforcement Officers’ Pension System – Participating Governmental Units – Baltimore City School Police Force
REMOVED: 11:55 AM

Capital Budget Subcommittee
Change made: March 1, 2024 11:15 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 4, 2024 3:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Maryland School for the Deaf
REMOVED: 11:15 AM
Maryland Higher Education Commission
REMOVED: 11:15 AM
University of Maryland Medical System
REMOVED: 11:15 AM
Maryland Independent College and University Association
REMOVED: 11:15 AM

Economic Matters Committee
Change made: March 1, 2024 9:31 AM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Voting Session
March 1, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
HB0190
Del Hill

Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - First Responders
HB0253
Chr ECM (Maryland Cannabis Administration

Cannabis Reform - Alterations
HB0265
Del Qi

Insurance - Producer Licensing Requirements - Education and Experience
HB0323
Del Guyton

Environment - Commission on Climate Change Membership - Addition
HB0426
Del Bhandari

Places of Public Accommodation - Motion Picture Houses - Captioning
HB0518
Dels Taveras and Woods

Public Service Commission - Performance-Based Regulation - Study
HB0520
Del A. Johnson

State Real Estate Commission - Complaints - Advertising Violations
HB0554
Del Charkoudian

Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage
HB0584
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - First Responders (Caring for Public Employees in the Safety Professions - CAPES Act)
HB0602
The Spkr and Del Clippinger

Employment Discrimination – Sexual Orientation
HB0604
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Families Serve Act of 2024
HB0663
Del Ebersole

Alcoholic Beverage Tax - Ready-to-Drink Cocktails
HB0679
Del Jackson

Security Systems Technicians - Applicants - Authority to Practice
HB0702
Del Wilson

Wage and Hour Law - Minor League Baseball Players - Exemption
HB0738
Del Wims, et al

Business Regulation - Licensed Home Improvement Contractors - Liability Insurance
HB0749
Del Amprey

Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions
HB0847
Del Amprey

Alcoholic Beverages - Class A License - Food Retailers

Environment Subcommittee
Change made: March 1, 2024 9:56 AM - HEARING ADDED
Environment Subcommittee - Work Session
March 6, 2024 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Family Law Subcommittee
Change made: March 1, 2024 11:53 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Family Law Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
March 4, 2024 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0648
Del Crutchfield, et al

Family Law - Child Support - Actual Income
ADDED: 11:53 AM

Change made: March 1, 2024 4:11 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Family Law Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
March 11, 2024 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0911
Del Valentine, et al

Peace Orders - Visual Surveillance
ADDED: 11:53 AM
HB0542
Del Vogel, et al

Department of Human Services - Children in Foster Care - Luggage
REMOVED: 4:11 PM

Housing and Real Property Subcommittee
Change made: March 1, 2024 9:56 AM - HEARING ADDED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Work Session
March 6, 2024 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee
Change made: March 1, 2024 9:54 AM - HEARING ADDED
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - Work Session
March 5, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee
Change made: March 1, 2024 9:59 AM - HEARING ADDED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
March 7, 2024 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee
Change made: March 1, 2024 9:55 AM - HEARING ADDED
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Work Session
March 5, 2024 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Change made: March 1, 2024 9:14 AM - HEARING ADDED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
March 21, 2024 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Board Meeting

No. 4 - Baltimore County
Change made: March 1, 2024 4:28 PM - HEARING ADDED
No. 4 - Baltimore County - Other
March 4, 2024 3:30 PM
Miller Senate Building, Welcome Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD

Click to return on the top page