Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/1/2023 11:07:19 AM
Wednesday, February 1, 2023
Wednesday, February 1, 2023
Senate
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: February 1, 2023 10:03 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Briefing
February 1, 2023 2:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 1, 2023 1:00 PM)
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Overview of Blueprint Implementation by Accountability and Implementation Board

Finance Committee
Change made: February 1, 2023 10:36 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 14, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0349
Sen M. Washington

State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - License and Registration Issuance and Renewals - Electronic Means
ADDED: 10:36 AM
SB0362
Sen Guzzone, et al

Certified Community Behavioral Health Clinics – Established
ADDED: 10:36 AM

House
Economic Matters Committee
Change made: February 1, 2023 9:44 AM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
February 2, 2023 1:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Reduction Act legislation
Public Service Commission (PSC), Maryland Energy Administration, & Invited Utilities

Judiciary Committee
Change made: February 1, 2023 11:01 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 8, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0360
Del Szeliga, et al

Reckless and Negligent Driving – Death of Another – Must–Appear Violation (Sherry’s and Christian’s Law)
HB0364
Del Grammer

Public Safety - Handgun Permit Requirement - Repeal (Maryland's Constitutional Carry Act of 2023)
HB0394
Del Watson

Maryland Tort Claims Act - Denial of Claims - Notice
HB0413
Del Grammer, et al

Firearms - Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry
HB0451
Del Atterbeary

Drunk Driving Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program
HB0483
Del Simmons, et al

Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel - Prior Convictions

Change made: February 1, 2023 11:01 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 15, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0481
Del Conaway, et al

Criminal Law – Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting a Handgun – Penalty

Change made: February 1, 2023 9:10 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 16, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0403
Del Cardin

Juvenile Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying - Inquiry by Intake Officer
HB0405
Del Foley, et al

Criminal Law - Animal Abuse or Neglect - Penalties
HB0440
Del Charles

Child Custody - Relocation of Child - Expedited Hearing (Assurance of Child's Safety Act)

Change made: February 1, 2023 9:10 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 21, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0411
Del Embry, et al

Criminal Procedure - Violation of Pretrial or Posttrial Condition by Incarcerated Person - Victim Contact
HB0412
Del Shetty, et al

Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Consent and Second-Degree Rape
HB0426
Del Lopez, et al

Correctional Facilities - Transgender, Nonbinary, and Intersex Inmates (Transgender Respect, Agency, and Dignity Act)
HB0427
Del Cardin, et al

Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity
HB0430
Del Wilkins

Police Immunity and Accountability Act
HB0433
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Office of the Sheriff - Duties and Deputy Sheriffs PG 308-23
HB0439
Frederick County Delegation

Frederick County – Adult Detention Center – Polygraph Examinations of Employees
HB0484
Del Conaway

Criminal Procedure - Restitution - Out-of-Pocket Loss
HB0506
Dels Grammer and Moon

Criminal Law - Manufacturing of Controlled Dangerous Substances - Cannabis Products and Concentrated Cannabis

Click to return on the top page