Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/21/2022 3:11:57 PM
Friday, January 21, 2022
Friday, January 21, 2022
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: January 21, 2022 9:21 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
January 25, 2022 1:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: January 25, 2022 1:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing by the Office of Legislative Audits: Review of Certain Emergency Procurements Related to the State of Maryland's COVID-19 Response

Change made: January 21, 2022 9:21 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
January 25, 2022 2:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: January 25, 2022 1:30 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
SB0009
Sen West

Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Qualification and Certification
SB0059
Sen McCray

Maryland Transportation Authority - Options for the Payment of Tolls and Civil Penalties
SB0174
Chr B&T (Dept)

Mortality and Quality Review Committee - Duties, Reports, and Data - Sunset Extension
SB0192
Chr B&T (Dept)

State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Reauthorization Extension
SB0228
Sen Ferguson

Maryland Corps Program – Revisions
SB0235
Sen Jackson

Income Tax - Personal Exemption - Disabled Individuals
SB0236
Sen Salling

Maryland Veterans Trust Fund – CAM for Veterans Grant Program – Established (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day))
SB0240
Sen Simonaire

Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - Sale of Sewing Items
SB0245
Sen Kagan

Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding
SB0247
Sen Hayes

State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Real Property Assessments and Appeals
SB0248
Sen Hayes

Minority Business Enterprises – Calculation of Participation Rates – Procurements From Maryland Correctional Enterprises
SB0251
Sen Hayes

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Centenarians
SB0260
Sen West

Department of General Services Broker Rebate Fee Fund - Established
SB0264
Sen Elfreth, et al

Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Energy and Property Taxes

Finance Committee
Change made: January 21, 2022 12:42 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
January 27, 2022 4:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

House
Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: January 21, 2022 11:00 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 3, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0193
Dor Co Deleg, et al

Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
ADDED: 11:00 AM

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: January 21, 2022 2:46 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
January 24, 2022 4:15 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0043
Del Hill

Department of General Services – Energy–Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2022)
HB0097
Del Amprey

Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, and Other Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals
HB0126
Del Crosby

General Provisions – Standard Time – Year–Round Daylight Saving Time

Change made: January 21, 2022 12:22 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
January 25, 2022 2:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0005
Del Krimm

State Government - State and Local Government Employees and Contractors - Cybersecurity Training
REMOVED: 12:22 PM
HB0177
Dels Bartlett and Wilson

9–1–1 Registry Program – Autism and Other Special Needs – Established
REMOVED: 12:22 PM

Change made: January 21, 2022 12:22 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2022 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0213
Del Kelly

Health Information Exchanges – Definition and Privacy Regulations
HB0287
Del Pena-Melnyk, et al

Secretary of Health - Professional Qualification Requirement
HB0293
Del K. Young, et al

Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services - 9-8-8 Trust Fund
HB0297
Del Rosenberg

Facilities – Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care – Safety Plans

Change made: January 21, 2022 12:23 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 8, 2022 2:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0005
Del Krimm

State Government - State and Local Government Employees and Contractors - Cybersecurity Training
ADDED: 12:23 PM

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee
Change made: January 21, 2022 12:22 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Work Session
January 27, 2022 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
- HBs 21 and 155

Other
Howard
Change made: January 21, 2022 1:45 PM - HEARING ADDED
Howard - Other
January 26, 2022 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Howard County House Delegation and Howard County Senators meeting on proposed local legislation.

Montgomery
Change made: January 21, 2022 2:33 PM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
January 27, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Economic Development Committee.

Click to return on the top page