Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 12/1/2021 7:45:12 PM
Wednesday, December 1, 2021
Wednesday, December 1, 2021
Senate
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Change made: December 1, 2021 8:53 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Reapportionment and Redistricting - Bill Hearing
December 1, 2021 9:00 AM
(Previous Date/Time: December 1, 2021 8:17 PM)
(Previous Date/Time: December 1, 2021 8:40 AM)
(Previous Date/Time: December 1, 2021 8:50 AM)
Zoom / YouTube
SB2003
Sens Waldstreicher and Ready

OIS Test

Other
General Assembly Compensation Commission
Change made: December 1, 2021 1:15 PM - HEARING ADDED
General Assembly Compensation Commission - Other
January 3, 2022 2:00 PM
Location-TBD
Decisions
Review of Supplemental Materials

Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
Change made: December 1, 2021 11:54 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Other
December 7, 2021 1:00 PM to December 7, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Recommendations

Judicial Compensation Commission
Change made: December 1, 2021 3:36 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Judicial Compensation Commission - Other
December 13, 2021 1:00 PM to December 13, 2021 3:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: December 13, 2021 1:00 PM to 2:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
Presentation of Compensation Materials.

Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission
Change made: December 1, 2021 4:04 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission - Other
December 16, 2021 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange briefings on: 1) Maryland Easy Enrollment Program; 2) increasing affordable health insurance coverage and cost-sharing for individuals not eligible for existing programs; and 3) high deductible health plan enrollees, cost impacts, and service utilization.
Wakely presentation on the actuarial report conducted on the options for implementing Medicaid buy-in programs in Maryland; and

Click to return on the top page