Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 3/1/2021 9:27:42 AM
Monday, March 1, 2021
Monday, March 1, 2021
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: March 1, 2021 7:32 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
March 4, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0806
Sen Peters

Labor and Employment – Workplace Fraud Act – Rebuttable Presumption of the Employer–Employee Relationship
REMOVED: 7:32 AM

House
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee
Change made: March 1, 2021 9:23 AM - HEARING ADDED
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Work Session
March 2, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
- HB 598, 643, 689, 812

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: March 1, 2021 9:08 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
March 23, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0006
Sens Lam and Hough

General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
SB0296
Sen Simonaire

Election Law – Campaign Finance – Protection of Contributor Information
SB0310
Chr EHE (Dept)

Election Law – Campaign Finance Entities – Termination
SB0325
Chr B&T (Dept)

Tax Sales – Redemption – Nondelinquent Taxes
SB0366
Sen McCray

Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force

Other
No. 11 - Baltimore City
Change made: March 1, 2021 8:42 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
March 8, 2021 6:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.

Change made: March 1, 2021 8:44 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
March 12, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.

Click to return on the top page