Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 12/1/2022 10:25:47 PM
Thursday, December 1, 2022
Thursday, December 1, 2022
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Change made: December 1, 2022 1:01 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
December 1, 2022 1:03 PM
(Previous Date/Time: December 1, 2022 1:00 PM)
Virtual Meeting
Discussion and adoption of the Blueprint Comprehensive Implementation Plan and related materials.

Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
Change made: December 1, 2022 7:04 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee - Other
December 6, 2022 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
TBD
REMOVED: 7:04 AM
Audit: Part 2 Maryland Department of Labor - Division of Unemployment Insurance
ADDED: 7:04 AM
OLA: Report on Follow-up Process and Repeat Audit Findings
ADDED: 7:04 AM
Office of Legislative Audits (OLA): Fraud Investigation Unit Update and Results
ADDED: 7:04 AM
OLA: Summary of Audit Reports and Recommended Committee Action
ADDED: 7:04 AM
Audit: Part 1 Maryland Department of Labor - Division of Unemployment Insurance
ADDED: 7:04 AM

Joint Committee on Pensions
Change made: December 1, 2022 2:27 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Joint Committee on Pensions - Other
December 14, 2022 3:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: December 14, 2022 2:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
Decisions
Investment Overview

Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority
Change made: December 1, 2022 12:55 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority - Other
December 5, 2022 12:00 PM
Conference Call
Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority Meeting

Click to return on the top page