Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 3/20/2023 12:09:07 PM
Monday, March 20, 2023
Monday, March 20, 2023
Senate
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: March 20, 2023 10:20 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
March 23, 2023 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
HB0299
Del Lehman, et al

Environment - Synthetic Turf - Chain of Custody
ADDED: 10:20 AM

Finance Committee
Change made: March 20, 2023 11:52 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
March 21, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0565
Sens Ready and Klausmeier

Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Audits of Pharmacies and Pharmacists
REMOVED: 11:52 AM
SB0895
Sens Ready and Klausmeier

Pharmacy Benefits Administration - Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Pharmacy Benefits Managers
REMOVED: 11:52 AM
SB0896
Sens Ready and Klausmeier

Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions
REMOVED: 11:52 AM
SB0898
Sens Ready and Klausmeier

Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Definitions of Carrier, ERISA, and Purchaser
REMOVED: 11:52 AM

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: March 20, 2023 10:15 AM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
March 20, 2023 12:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: March 20, 2023 10:32 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
March 20, 2023 12:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0830
Del Terrasa, et al

Residential Construction or Significant Renovation - Electric Vehicle Charging
ADDED: 9:59 AM
HB0934
Del Hutchinson, et al

Natural Resources - Female Deer Hunting Contests - Authorization
ADDED: 9:59 AM
HB1087
Wicomico County Delegation

Wicomico County - Sunday Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones
ADDED: 9:59 AM
HB0423
Del Holmes

Task Force on Common Ownership Communities
ADDED: 10:32 AM

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: March 20, 2023 10:06 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
March 30, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
SB0469
Sens Elfreth and Guzzone

Task Force to Study Solar Tax Incentives
ADDED: 10:06 AM

Click to return on the top page