Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/26/2024 10:22:31 AM
Monday, February 26, 2024
Monday, February 26, 2024
House
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee
Change made: February 26, 2024 9:04 AM - HEARING ADDED
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
February 28, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB84, HB149, HB328, HB566, HB581, HB598, HB673, HB723, HB809, HB1002

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee
Change made: February 26, 2024 9:02 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Work Session
February 29, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB499, HB757, HB759, HB806, HB874, HB938, HB1103

Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee
Change made: February 26, 2024 9:00 AM - HEARING ADDED
Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee - Work Session
February 27, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB827, HB939, HB953

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: February 26, 2024 10:21 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Voting Session
February 26, 2024 3:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0054
Del Atterbeary

Property Tax - Transfer to Heir - Payment Plans
HB0066
Del Charkoudian

Property Tax Credits - Public School Employees, Health and Safety Improvements, and Property Used for Local Housing Programs
HB0204
Del Attar, et al

Education – Coaches – Mental Health Training
HB0208
Chr W&M (Dept)

County Public Libraries - Overdue Library Materials - Minors
HB0336
Del Forbes, et al

Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Materials for Individualized Education Program Meetings
HB0452
The Spkr (Office of the Comptroller)

Individual Tax Preparers - Code of Ethics, Notification of Actions, Enforcement, and Penalties (Stop Scam Tax Preparers Act)
HB0454
The Spkr (Office of the Comptroller)

Disclosure of Tax Information - Tax Compliance Activity and Binding Data Use Agreements
HB0615
Del Ruth, et al

Education - Prohibited Behavior on School Grounds and Property - Application
HB0634
Del Smith

Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center – Student Information – United States Census Bureau
HB0646
Del Simmons, et al

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliary and Reserve Volunteers
HB0753
Del Young

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Application and Reporting Requirements
HB0776
Del Feldmark

Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Authority

Click to return on the top page