Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/22/2024 4:44:28 PM
Thursday, February 22, 2024
Thursday, February 22, 2024
Senate
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: February 22, 2024 4:30 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Work Session
February 26, 2024 4:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 26, 2024 3:00 PM)
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Information Technology Workforce

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: February 22, 2024 3:28 PM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
February 23, 2024 12:55 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: February 22, 2024 10:15 AM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
February 23, 2024 3:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Change made: February 22, 2024 1:03 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 7, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0440
Charles County Delegation

Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Cobb Island
ADDED: 1:03 PM

Change made: February 22, 2024 1:03 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 8, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0668
Del Pruski

Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary
ADDED: 1:03 PM
HB0687
Charles County Delegation

Charles County – Governing Bodies of Common Ownership Communities – Member Training
ADDED: 1:03 PM
HB0720
Carroll County Delegation

Carroll County – Deputy Clerk or Deputy Sheriff – Oath of Office
ADDED: 1:03 PM
HB0839
Carroll County Delegation

Carroll County - Contracts and Purchasing
ADDED: 1:03 PM
HB1080
Carroll County Delegation

Carroll County - Office of Permits and Inspections - Denial of Permit or License for Unpaid Personal Property Taxes
ADDED: 1:03 PM
HB1321
Charles County Delegation

Land Use - Southern Maryland Code Counties - Subdivision Regulations - Property Dedication and Fee
ADDED: 1:03 PM

Environment Subcommittee
Change made: February 22, 2024 3:51 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment Subcommittee - Work Session
February 28, 2024 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 22, 2024 10:08 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 5, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1388
Del Hill

Labor and Employment – Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses – Veterinary and Health Care Professionals
ADDED: 10:08 AM

Change made: February 22, 2024 10:08 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 8, 2024 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1388
Del Hill

Labor and Employment – Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses – Veterinary and Health Care Professionals
REMOVED: 10:08 AM

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee
Change made: February 22, 2024 9:11 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Work Session
February 22, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB146, HB152, HB628, and HB755
REMOVED: 9:11 AM
HB146, HB152, HB628, and HB755
ADDED: 9:11 AM
HB380
ADDED: 9:11 AM

Housing and Real Property Subcommittee
Change made: February 22, 2024 3:52 PM - HEARING ADDED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Work Session
February 28, 2024 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Judiciary Committee
Change made: February 22, 2024 1:01 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
March 6, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB1301
Del Baker, et al

Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting Firearms – Business Sign Posting Requirements
REMOVED: 1:01 PM

Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee
Change made: February 22, 2024 3:49 PM - HEARING ADDED
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - Work Session
February 27, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Local Revenues Subcommittee
Change made: February 22, 2024 9:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Local Revenues Subcommittee - Work Session
February 27, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee
Change made: February 22, 2024 3:55 PM - HEARING ADDED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
February 29, 2024 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee
Change made: February 22, 2024 3:56 PM - HEARING ADDED
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Work Session
February 27, 2024 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee
Change made: February 22, 2024 3:50 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Work Session
February 27, 2024 11:00 AM
(Previous Date/Time: February 27, 2024 1:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
HB97, HB393, HB548, HB887

Click to return on the top page