Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 3/4/2024 10:29:30 PM
Monday, March 4, 2024
Monday, March 4, 2024
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: March 4, 2024 3:36 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Other
March 8, 2024 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Subcommittee Report Decisions to Full Committee followed by Full Decision and Vote on Operating Budget and the BRFA
REMOVED: 3:35 PM
Subcommittees Report Decisions to Full Committee followed by Full Decision and Vote on Operating Budget and the BRFA
ADDED: 3:35 PM
REMOVED: 3:36 PM
Subcommittees Report Decisions to Full Committee followed by Full Committee Decision and Vote on Operating Budget and the BRFA
ADDED: 3:36 PM

Capital Budget Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2024 3:35 PM - HEARING ADDED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Other
March 6, 2024 2:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Decision
REMOVED: 3:35 PM
Decisions
ADDED: 3:35 PM

Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2024 2:49 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Other
March 6, 2024 2:45 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Decisions

Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: March 4, 2024 12:26 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
March 5, 2024 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0936
Sen Gallion

Environment - Wood Vaults - Authorization and Permit Requirements
REMOVED: 10:26 AM
SB0798
Sen Hester

Stream Restoration Contractors Licensing Board, Stream Restoration Contractors, and Stream Restoration Project Requirements
REMOVED: 12:26 PM

Change made: March 4, 2024 8:29 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
March 6, 2024 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0856
Sen McKay

Education - Minimum School Funding - Waiver
REMOVED: 8:29 PM

Change made: March 4, 2024 2:47 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
March 12, 2024 1:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 11, 2024 1:00 PM)
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0798
Sen Hester

Stream Restoration Contractors Licensing Board, Stream Restoration Contractors, and Stream Restoration Project Requirements

Health and Human Services Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2024 2:49 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - Other
March 6, 2024 2:15 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Decisions

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: March 4, 2024 10:31 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
March 7, 2024 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB1108
Carroll County Senators

Carroll County - Deputy Clerk or Deputy Sheriff - Oath of Office
ADDED: 10:31 AM

Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2024 2:49 PM - HEARING ADDED
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Other
March 6, 2024 2:30 PM
Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Decisions

House
Alcoholic Beverages Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2024 1:31 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Alcoholic Beverages Subcommittee - Work Session
March 8, 2024 3:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 4, 2024 3:30 PM)
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
(Previous Location: Zoom / YouTube)

Appropriations Committee
Change made: March 4, 2024 4:41 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 6, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
HB0527
Del Solomon

Legacy Admissions
REMOVED: 11:42 AM
HB1415
Del Smith

Education - Community Schools - Report
REMOVED: 4:41 PM

Civil Law and Procedure Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2024 4:20 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Civil Law and Procedure Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
March 5, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB1308
Dels Wivell and Valentine

Real Property - Recordation of Instrument With False Information - Penalties and Actions to Quiet Title
ADDED: 4:20 PM

Criminal Law and Procedure Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2024 4:26 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Criminal Law and Procedure Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
March 6, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0597
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Growing Apprenticeships and the Public Safety Workforce (GAPS) Act
ADDED: 4:05 PM
HB0892
Del Kaufman, et al

Criminal Law - Benefits Trafficking
ADDED: 4:05 PM
HB1041
Del Cardin, et al

Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Religion and Disability
ADDED: 4:05 PM
HB0145
Dels Pippy and Simpson

Criminal Law - Revenge Porn - Visual Representation
ADDED: 4:08 PM
HB0485
Del Fair, et al

Public Health - Prohibition on Transfer of Human Immunodeficiency Virus - Repeal
ADDED: 4:26 PM

Economic Matters Committee
Change made: March 4, 2024 4:38 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
March 5, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
HB1414
Del Fair

Electronic Smoking Devices - Licensure, Indoor Use, and Taxation - Alterations
REMOVED: 4:38 PM

Change made: March 4, 2024 3:02 PM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
March 12, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
HB1420
Del Kaiser

Cybersecurity - Office of People's Counsel, Public Service Companies, Public Service Commission, and Maryland Cybersecurity Council

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: March 4, 2024 2:20 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 5, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB1207
Del Pippy

Condominiums - Mandatory Homeowners Insurance Coverage - Detached Units
REMOVED: 2:20 PM

Change made: March 4, 2024 1:59 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
March 5, 2024 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 4, 2024 4:27 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 6, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB1250
Del Lehman, et al

Environment - Wood Vaults - Authorization and Permit Requirements
REMOVED: 4:27 PM

Change made: March 4, 2024 2:00 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
March 6, 2024 2:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 4, 2024 1:58 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
March 8, 2024 3:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2024 9:32 AM - HEARING ADDED
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
March 6, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HBs 566, 594, 723, 784, 894, 962, 1012, 1134, and 1155.

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: March 4, 2024 8:57 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 6, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1148
The Spkr (Atty Gen Ofc)

Health Care Facilities – Notice to Consumers – Out–of–Network Status (Health Care Provider Out–of–Network Information Act)
REMOVED: 8:57 AM

Health and Social Services Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2024 11:08 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 4, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 150, Annapolis, MD
(Previous Location: House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD)
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange
DHS Child Support Administration
DHS Office of Home Energy Programs

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2024 9:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Work Session
March 7, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HBs 499, 806, 959, and 1053.

Judiciary Committee
Change made: March 4, 2024 1:00 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
March 12, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB1346
Dels Clippinger and Pena-Melnyk

Competency Evaluations and Commitment Orders - Modification

Other
Baltimore County
Change made: March 4, 2024 4:55 PM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore County - Other
March 8, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Bill Voting- None
Briefing - Court Appointed Special Advocates for Children (CASA) of Baltimore County, Senator Chris Van Hollen
Bill Hearings - none

Hall of Records Commission
Change made: March 4, 2024 1:00 PM - HEARING ADDED
Hall of Records Commission - Other
June 13, 2024 2:00 PM
Google Meet Video Conference
Semi-annual meeting of the Hall of Records Commission

Harford
Change made: March 4, 2024 1:54 PM - HEARING ADDED
Harford - Other
March 7, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Weekly Meeting

Click to return on the top page