Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/30/2023 1:23:50 PM
Monday, January 30, 2023
Monday, January 30, 2023
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: January 30, 2023 9:44 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 14, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0213
Sen Ellis

Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing
SB0215
Sens Ellis and Augustine

Massage Therapy - Definition and Discipline
SB0216
Sens Ellis and Augustine

Massage Therapy - Definition and Reimbursement
SB0237
Sen Klausmeier

Public Health - Dental Services - Access
SB0255
Sen Hester

Public Health - Home- and Community-Based Services for Children and Youth
SB0278
Sen Waldstreicher

Perfusionists - Licensure Exemption - Employees and Agents of Federally Designated Organ Procurement Organizations

Change made: January 30, 2023 9:27 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 15, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0281
Sen Lam, et al

Commission on Public Health – Establishment
SB0307
Sen Klausmeier

Financial Institutions – Mortgage Loan Originators – Independent Contractors
SB0308
Sens Klausmeier and Hershey

Health Insurance – Utilization Review – Revisions

Change made: January 30, 2023 9:44 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 21, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0128
Sen Hester

Economic Development – Emergency Relief Program – Established
SB0136
Sen Klausmeier

Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Limitation and Methods
SB0331
Sen Hayes

Baltimore City – West North Avenue Development Authority – Membership and Procurement

Change made: January 30, 2023 11:31 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 24, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0304
Carroll County Senators

Carroll County – Alcoholic Beverages – Modification of Seating Requirements
ADDED: 9:27 AM
SB0306
Carroll County Senators

Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Event Entertainment Licenses
ADDED: 9:27 AM
SB0245
Sens Carozza and Mautz

Wicomico County - Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses - Issuance
ADDED: 9:44 AM
REMOVED: 11:31 AM

House
Economic Matters Committee
Change made: January 30, 2023 12:33 PM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
February 2, 2023 10:30 AM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Maryland Department of the Environment
National Conference of State Legislatures

Change made: January 30, 2023 12:33 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
February 9, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
HB0037
Del Stewart

Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Telephone Solicitation (Stop the Spam Calls Act of 2023)
ADDED: 12:33 PM
HB0062
Del Charkoudian

Land Use - Public Service Companies - Pollinator-Friendly Vegetation Management
ADDED: 12:33 PM
HB0068
Del Korman

Electricity – Net Energy Metering – Accrual of Net Excess Generation (Net Metering Flexibility Act)
ADDED: 12:33 PM
HB0355
Del Bridges

Baltimore City Lifeline Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program
ADDED: 12:33 PM

Housing and Real Property Subcommittee
Change made: January 30, 2023 9:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Briefing
February 10, 2023 11:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Judiciary Committee
Change made: January 30, 2023 10:09 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
January 31, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0097
Del Bartlett

Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Periods
REMOVED: 10:09 AM

Change made: January 30, 2023 10:09 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 14, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0097
Del Bartlett

Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Periods
ADDED: 10:09 AM

Other
Maryland Insurance Administration
Change made: January 30, 2023 11:12 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Insurance Administration - Other
February 28, 2023 1:00 PM to February 28, 2023 3:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
The purpose of the hearing is for insurance company officials to explain the reasons for rate increases, to explain the new benefit options and for the MIA to consider whether the proposed rate increase is in compliance with Maryland's laws and regulations relating to long-term care insurance.
The Maryland Insurance Administration will conduct a public hearing on specific rate increase requests made by Genworth Life Insurance Company and Assurity Life Insurance Company. In the group long-term care market, these include requests from Genworth Life Insurance Company.

Click to return on the top page