Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/7/2023 2:05:14 PM
Tuesday, February 7, 2023
Tuesday, February 7, 2023
Senate
Capital Budget Subcommittee
Change made: February 7, 2023 10:54 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 14, 2023 2:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Department of State Police
REMOVED: 10:54 AM

Change made: February 7, 2023 10:55 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 21, 2023 2:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Department of State Police
ADDED: 10:55 AM

House
Capital Budget Subcommittee
Change made: February 7, 2023 9:19 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 15, 2023 4:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Department of State Police
REMOVED: 9:19 AM

Change made: February 7, 2023 9:20 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 22, 2023 4:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Department of State Police
ADDED: 9:20 AM

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: February 7, 2023 10:11 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 21, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0166
Del Grammer

Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
ADDED: 10:11 AM
HB0338
Del Boyce, et al

Baltimore City - Commercial Use - Definition
ADDED: 10:11 AM

Change made: February 7, 2023 10:13 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 22, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0683
Del T. Morgan, et al

Natural Resources – Apprentice Hunting License – Alterations
ADDED: 10:13 AM

Change made: February 7, 2023 10:15 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 23, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0431
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems on Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) – Penalties PG 303–23
ADDED: 10:15 AM
HB0435
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 304–23
ADDED: 10:15 AM
HB0652
Del Boyce

Vehicle Laws – Special and Commemorative Registration Plate – Maryland Heroes
ADDED: 10:15 AM
HB0659
Del Arentz, et al

Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Prohibition on Trailers in Contraflow Lanes - Study
ADDED: 10:15 AM

Change made: February 7, 2023 10:18 AM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 24, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0639
Del Smith

Restrictions on Use - Solar Collector Systems - Alteration
HB0684
Del Wilkins

Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases and Holdover Tenancies - Local Just Cause Termination Provisions
HB0688
Dels S. Johnson and A. Johnson

Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request
HB0691
Del Stewart

Landlord and Tenant - Failure to Repair Serious and Dangerous Defects - Tenant Remedies (Tenant Safety Act)
HB0695
Dels Sample-Hughes and Adams

Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund – Revisions and Sunset Repeal (Rural Communities Improvement Act of 2023)
HB0696
Del Addison

Natural Resources - Black Bass Conservation Fund - Establishment

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 7, 2023 9:35 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 22, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0475
Del Rosenberg

Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
ADDED: 9:35 AM

Change made: February 7, 2023 9:35 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 1, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0475
Del Rosenberg

Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
REMOVED: 9:35 AM

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: February 7, 2023 10:37 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 23, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0641
Del Wivell, et al

Income Tax - Pregnancy Options Tax Credit
ADDED: 9:51 AM
HB0647
Del Wivell, et al

Income Tax - Itemized Deductions
ADDED: 9:51 AM
HB0653
Del Buckel

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program - Establishment
ADDED: 9:51 AM
HB0668
Del Allen, et al

Gaming – Problem Gambling Fund – Table Game Fees and Distribution of Sports Wagering Proceeds
ADDED: 9:51 AM
HB0678
Del Sample-Hughes, et al

Sales and Use Tax - Electricity for Agricultural Purposes
ADDED: 9:51 AM
HB0680
Del Toles, et al

Income Tax - Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit - Alterations
ADDED: 9:51 AM
HB0706
Del A. Jones

Economic Development - Sustainable Communities - Business Facade Improvement Program
ADDED: 9:51 AM
HB0708
The Spkr (Office of the Comptroller)

Unemployment Insurance - Tax Parity for Delayed Payments of Benefits
ADDED: 10:37 AM

Other
Frederick
Change made: February 7, 2023 11:04 AM - HEARING ADDED
Frederick - Other
February 9, 2023 8:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Frederick County Delegation Weekly Meeting.

Prince George's
Change made: February 7, 2023 10:44 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Prince George's - Other
February 9, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Courts
The Law Enforcement Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
Police
Alcoholic Beverages
Criminal Procedure
Public Safety
Gaming

Washington
Change made: February 7, 2023 1:16 PM - HEARING ADDED
Washington - Other
February 9, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Washington County Delegation Meeting

Click to return on the top page