Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/26/2024 9:46:22 AM
Monday, February 26, 2024
Monday, February 26, 2024
House
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee
Change made: February 26, 2024 9:04 AM - HEARING ADDED
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
February 28, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB84, HB149, HB328, HB566, HB581, HB598, HB673, HB723, HB809, HB1002

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee
Change made: February 26, 2024 9:02 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Work Session
February 29, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB499, HB757, HB759, HB806, HB874, HB938, HB1103

Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee
Change made: February 26, 2024 9:00 AM - HEARING ADDED
Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee - Work Session
February 27, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB827, HB939, HB953

Click to return on the top page