Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/28/2024 8:46:29 PM
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: February 28, 2024 9:31 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 28, 2024 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0903
Sen Muse

Prince George’s County – Mobile Sports Wagering Proceeds – Local Impact Grant
REMOVED: 9:31 AM

Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: February 28, 2024 5:42 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
February 29, 2024 4:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Change made: February 28, 2024 3:00 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
March 1, 2024 9:00 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0129
Sen Kagan

Election Law - Election Costs and Administration
REMOVED: 2:20 PM
SB0493
Sen Kagan

Elections – Ranked–Choice Voting – Contests for Presidential Nomination in 2028
REMOVED: 2:20 PM
SB0695
Sen Feldman

Building Code - Construction and Significant Renovation of Housing Units - Electric Vehicle Parking Spaces
REMOVED: 2:20 PM
SB0918
Sen Brooks

Retail Choice Customer Education and Protection Fund - Purposes and Uses
REMOVED: 2:20 PM
SB0935
Sen Gallion

Department of General Services - Renewable Natural Gas Pilot Program - Establishment
REMOVED: 2:20 PM
SB1084
Sen M. Washington

State Government - Commission for the Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard of Hearing
REMOVED: 2:20 PM
SB1023
Sen Brooks, et al

Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric– and Solar–Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024)
REMOVED: 3:00 PM

Change made: February 28, 2024 3:01 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
March 4, 2024 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0129
Sen Kagan

Election Law - Election Costs and Administration
SB0493
Sen Kagan

Elections – Ranked–Choice Voting – Contests for Presidential Nomination in 2028
SB0695
Sen Feldman

Building Code - Construction and Significant Renovation of Housing Units - Electric Vehicle Parking Spaces
SB0918
Sen Brooks

Retail Choice Customer Education and Protection Fund - Purposes and Uses
SB0935
Sen Gallion

Department of General Services - Renewable Natural Gas Pilot Program - Establishment
SB1084
Sen M. Washington

State Government - Commission for the Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard of Hearing
SB1023
Sen Brooks, et al

Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric– and Solar–Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024)
ADDED: 3:01 PM

Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: February 28, 2024 12:00 PM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Appear
March 4, 2024 5:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

Change made: February 28, 2024 12:01 PM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Not Appear
March 4, 2024 5:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: February 28, 2024 12:32 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Appropriations Committee - Budget Hearing
February 28, 2024 4:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 28, 2024 12:45 PM)
(Previous Date/Time: February 28, 2024 12:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Governor's Office of Children

Civil Law and Procedure Subcommittee
Change made: February 28, 2024 6:42 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Civil Law and Procedure Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
March 5, 2024 12:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 1, 2024 12:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
HB0059
Del Mangione

Crimes of Violence - Motor Vehicle Theft
HB0392
Dels Stewart and Young

Evidence - Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Fair Housing Testing
HB0528
Del Buckel

Orphans' Court Judges - Restriction on Practicing Law
HB0698
Dels Bartlett and Pena-Melnyk

Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of the Person of a Disabled Person - Expedited Proceedings

Early Childhood Subcommittee
Change made: February 28, 2024 5:11 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Early Childhood Subcommittee - Work Session
February 29, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Election Law Subcommittee
Change made: February 28, 2024 7:10 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Election Law Subcommittee - Work Session
February 29, 2024 12:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 29, 2024 12:15 PM)
Zoom / YouTube

Family Law Subcommittee
Change made: February 28, 2024 3:27 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Family Law Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
March 11, 2024 3:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 6, 2024 12:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
HB0214
Dels Boyce and Grammer

Family Law – Adoption of an Adult
HB0508
Del Embry

Children - Labor Trafficking
HB0542
Del Vogel, et al

Department of Human Services - Children in Foster Care - Luggage

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 28, 2024 3:09 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 29, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1423
Dels S. Johnson and A. Johnson

Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Step Therapy, Fail-First Protocols, and Prior Authorization - Prescription Drugs to Treat Serious Mental Illness
REMOVED: 12:27 PM
HB1132
Del M. Morgan, et al

Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Off-Label Use - Promotion
REMOVED: 3:09 PM

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee
Change made: February 28, 2024 7:47 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Work Session
February 29, 2024 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB 786
ADDED: 7:47 PM

Judiciary Committee
Change made: February 28, 2024 4:28 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 29, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB1437
Del Grammer

Juvenile Law - Juvenile Crime Reform
REMOVED: 4:28 PM

Change made: February 28, 2024 6:37 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
February 29, 2024 4:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0005
Del Crosby

Criminal Law - Indecent Exposure Within the Presence of a Minor
HB0008
Del Fraser-Hidalgo

Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility
HB0070
Del Hill

Criminal Law - Interference With a Public Safety Answering Point - Penalties
HB0094
Del Pasteur

Correctional Services - Inmate Employment - Agricultural Work
HB0099
Del Bartlett

Criminal Law – Sexual Solicitation of a Minor Through Child Pornography – Prohibition
HB0137
Del Grammer

Civil Actions - Civil Immunity - Educator Intervention
HB0300
Del Toles, et al

Family Law - Marriage Ceremony - Designation of Deputy Clerk
HB0325
Del Cardin

Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition
HB0326
Del Cardin

Estates and Trusts - Appointment of Personal Representative - Objections
HB0432
Del Kaufman, et al

Courts and Judicial Proceedings and Criminal Procedure - Technical Corrections - References to Intellectual Disability
HB0458
Del Phillips, et al

Criminal Procedure - Protection of Identity of Minor Victim
REMOVED: 6:37 PM
HB0690
Charles County Delegation

Charles County - Adult Protective Services Review Board - Membership
HB0854
Del Bartlett

Sex Offenders - Required Registration - Locations

Oversight Committee on Personnel
Change made: February 28, 2024 7:27 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Oversight Committee on Personnel - Voting Session
February 29, 2024 9:10 AM
(Previous Date/Time: February 29, 2024 9:00 AM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Public Safety Subcommittee
Change made: February 28, 2024 4:28 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Public Safety Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
March 4, 2024 4:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0593
Del Hutchinson, et al

Criminal Law - Destroying Funerary Objects - Statute of Limitations
ADDED: 4:28 PM

Other
Maryland Economic Development Commission
Change made: February 28, 2024 10:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Economic Development Commission - Other
March 20, 2024 3:00 PM
Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Floor State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
Updates from the Department of Commerce; Preliminary discussion on the development of a Strategic Plan.

Montgomery
Change made: February 28, 2024 10:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
March 1, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation.

Change made: February 28, 2024 10:44 AM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
March 1, 2024 9:30 AM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Economic Development Committee.

Click to return on the top page