Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 9/24/2021 3:10:24 PM
Friday, September 24, 2021
Friday, September 24, 2021
House
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee
Change made: September 24, 2021 12:57 PM - HEARING ADDED
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Briefing
November 22, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Maryland Department of Transportation (MDOT) Briefing on the Draft Consolidated Transportation Program

Other
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Change made: September 24, 2021 1:20 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
October 6, 2021 2:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
Regular Meeting of the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission

State Park Investment Commission
Change made: September 24, 2021 9:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
State Park Investment Commission - Other
October 5, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Community Stakeholders' Session

Click to return on the top page