Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/21/2024 11:01:07 PM
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
Senate
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: February 21, 2024 5:14 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
February 22, 2024 4:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Finance Committee
Change made: February 21, 2024 12:43 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 23, 2024 10:00 AM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0656
Anne Arundel County Senators

Anne Arundel County – Board of License Commissioners – Membership
REMOVED: 12:43 PM

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: February 21, 2024 3:44 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
February 23, 2024 9:30 AM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

House
Early Childhood Subcommittee
Change made: February 21, 2024 11:08 AM - HEARING ADDED
Early Childhood Subcommittee - Work Session
February 22, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: February 21, 2024 9:23 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 8, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB1161
Dorchester County Delegation

Dorchester County - Sanitary Commission - Transfer of Powers to County Council
ADDED: 9:23 AM

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 21, 2024 12:01 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 22, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1043
Del Cullison

Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities - Study
REMOVED: 12:01 PM

Change made: February 21, 2024 11:50 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 27, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0984
Del Guzzone, et al

State Procurement - Apprenticeship Preference Program
REMOVED: 11:50 AM

Change made: February 21, 2024 2:19 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 12, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1417
Del Amprey

Economic Justice and Racial Reconciliation Act
REMOVED: 2:19 PM

Judiciary Committee
Change made: February 21, 2024 11:41 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 21, 2024 1:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 21, 2024 1:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0105
Del Atterbeary

Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program
HB0162
Dels Cardin and Moon

Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities
HB0546
Del Williams

Handgun Permits - Accidental Discharge and Training Requirements - Maryland State Police Gun Center (Firearm Safety Act of 2024)
HB0683
Dels Munoz and Miller

Homicide or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Parole Eligibility and Penalties
HB0779
Del Hornberger, et al

Handgun Qualification Licenses - Personally Identifying Information - Deletion and Destruction
HB0794
Del Moon, et al

Regulated Firearms - Maryland Voluntary Do Not Sell Firearm Process
HB0810
The Spkr

Criminal Law - Weapon Crimes - Switch/Auto-Sear
HB0832
Del Stewart

General Provisions - Damages or Losses - Definition
HB0869
Del Bartlett

Public Safety – Firearm Background Checks, Victim Notification, and the Maryland State Police Gun Center
HB0895
Del Embry

Maryland Tort Claims Act - Sheriffs and Deputy Sheriffs - County Responsibility
HB0922
The Spkr (Atty Gen Ofc)

State Government - Public Welfare Actions - Determinations and Settlements
HB0978
Del Young, et al

Courts – Maryland Court Text Message System – Establishing, Implementing, and Maintaining
HB0372
Dels Harris and Stewart

Montgomery County and Prince George's County - Rent Court Workforce Solutions Pilot Program
HB1086
Chr JUD (Atty Gen Ofc)

Compensation for Individuals Erroneously Convicted - Alterations

Change made: February 21, 2024 2:57 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 22, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB1071
Del Alston, et al

Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
REMOVED: 2:57 PM

Change made: February 21, 2024 9:44 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
February 22, 2024 4:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0814
The Spkr and Del Clippinger

Juvenile Law - Reform

Oversight Committee on Personnel
Change made: February 21, 2024 2:59 PM - HEARING ADDED
Oversight Committee on Personnel - Voting Session
February 22, 2024 9:30 AM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee
Change made: February 21, 2024 5:04 PM - HEARING ADDED
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Work Session
February 22, 2024 9:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB576
ADDED: 5:04 PM

Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Change made: February 21, 2024 1:45 PM - HEARING ADDED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
February 27, 2024 9:00 AM
Maryland State Dept. of Education, 200 West Baltimore Street, Baltimore, MD
Joint Board meeting with the Maryland State Board of Education.

Harford
Change made: February 21, 2024 10:28 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Harford - Other
February 22, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Weekly Meeting

Howard
Change made: February 21, 2024 9:00 AM - HEARING ADDED
Howard - Other
February 28, 2024 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Howard County Delegation meeting on proposed local bills and bonds.

Change made: February 21, 2024 9:01 AM - HEARING ADDED
Howard - Other
March 6, 2024 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Howard County Delegation meeting on proposed local bills and bonds.

Click to return on the top page