Update Report
As of: 3/29/2023 11:32:24 AM
Change made: March 29, 2023 9:43 AM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Other
March 29, 2023 12:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Voting Session
Change made: March 29, 2023 11:13 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
April 4, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
HB0691
Del Stewart
Landlord and Tenant - Failure to Repair Serious and Dangerous Defects - Tenant Remedies (Tenant Safety Act)
Change made: March 29, 2023 10:44 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
March 29, 2023 2:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 29, 2023 2:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Change made: March 29, 2023 10:35 AM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Voting Session
March 29, 2023 1:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
HB0590
Del Pruski
Workers' Compensation - Benefits - Offset and Hearing Loss
SB0023
Sen Brooks
Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services - Journeyman License - Qualifications
SB0136
Sen Klausmeier
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Limitation and Methods
SB0172
Sen Rosapepe
Employment for Minors - Opportunities for Work (Job Opportunities for High School Students Act)
SB0198
Sen Augustine
Elevator Safety – Privately Owned Single–Family Residential Elevators – Inspection and Registration Requirements
SB0241
Sen Guzzone (Office of the Comptroller)
Commercial Law – Abandoned Property – Alterations
SB0254
Sen Hester
Business Regulation - Charitable Organizations
SB0322
Sen Beidle, et al
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 4 Limited Winery License - Food Service
SB0377
Sen Kramer
Workers' Compensation - Benefits - Offset and Study
SB0431
Washington County Senators
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 9 Limited Distillery License - Self-Distribution
SB0443
Sen Brooks
Real Estate Brokers, Salespersons, and Associate Brokers - Continuing Education Courses - Alterations
SB0455
Sen Hayes, et al
Real Estate Appraisers - Licensing and Certification - Qualifications
SB0508
Sens Elfreth and Feldman
Hemp Farming Program - Consumable Hemp Products
SB0525
Sen McKay
Economic Development - Program Participation - Cannabis Business Establishments
SB0541
The Pres (Atty Gen Ofc)
Cigarettes - Wholesalers - Disclosure of Information
SB0542
The Pres (Atty Gen Ofc)
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Consumer Protections Against Price Gouging
SB0550
The Pres (Admin), et al
Financial Regulation - Maryland Community Investment Venture Fund - Establishment (Access to Banking Act)
SB0672
Sen Klausmeier
Alcoholic Beverages - Use of Alcoholic Beverages for Educational Purposes
SB0713
Chr, Educ, Energy, and Env Committee
State Board of Architects - Sunset Extension
SB0714
Chr, Educ, Energy, and Env Committee
State Board of Certified Interior Designers - Sunset Extension
SB0715
Chr, Educ, Energy, and the Env Committee
State Board of Foresters - Sunset Extension
SB0716
Chr, Educ, Energy, and Envi Committee
State Board of Examiners of Landscape Architects - Sunset Extension
SB0717
Chr Educ, Energy, and Env Committee
State Board of Stationary Engineers - Sunset Extension
SB0723
Chr B&T (Dept)
Corporations and Associations - Electronic Copies Fee - Repeal
SB0741
Sen Jackson
Public Safety - Refrigerants - Limitations on Use
SB0839
Sen Kramer
Labor and Employment - Workers' Compensation - Hernia
SB0929
Sen Griffith
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Name and Organization of Office
Change made: March 29, 2023 10:45 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
March 29, 2023 2:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB1232
Del Lopez
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccines
ADDED: 10:45 AM
SB0184
Sen Beidle, et al
Health Insurance - Diagnostic and Supplemental Examinations for Breast Cancer - Cost-Sharing
ADDED: 10:45 AM
SB0200
Sen Lam (State Brd of Chirpractc Exminrs)
Health Occupations - State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Disciplinary Actions and Procedures
ADDED: 10:45 AM
SB0213
Sen Ellis
Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing
ADDED: 10:45 AM
SB0216
Sens Ellis and Augustine
Massage Therapy - Definition, Registration, and Reimbursement
ADDED: 10:45 AM
SB0223
Sen Augustine, et al
State Government – State Facilities Changes and Closures – Procedures
ADDED: 10:45 AM
SB0232
Sen Beidle, et al
Health Occupations - Licensed Athletic Trainers - Dry Needling Approval
ADDED: 10:45 AM
SB0286
Sen Simonaire, et al
Department of Veterans Affairs - Burial in State Veterans' Cemeteries - Spouses and Dependents
ADDED: 10:45 AM
SB0346
Sen King, et al
Maryland Sign Language Interpreters Act
ADDED: 10:45 AM
SB0649
Sen Elfreth, et al
State Government - Regulation Procedures and the Maryland Register
ADDED: 10:45 AM
SB0786
Sen Hettleman
Health - Reproductive Health Services - Protected Information and Insurance Requirements
ADDED: 10:45 AM
Change made: March 29, 2023 8:26 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
March 29, 2023 4:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0808
Dels Williams and Hill
Reproductive Health Protection Act
ADDED: 8:26 AM
Change made: March 29, 2023 10:43 AM - HEARING ADDED
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - Work Session
March 30, 2023 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Change made: March 29, 2023 9:59 AM - HEARING ADDED
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Work Session
March 30, 2023 8:45 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB 319, HB 354, HB 1155, SB 154, SB 343, SB 558, SB 626, SB 644, and SB 732.
Change made: March 29, 2023 10:29 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority - Other
April 12, 2023 9:00 AM
One Call Center, Suite 104, Lower Level Conference Rm., 7223 Parkway Drive, Hanover, MD
In-Person Meeting of the Full Authority+Closed Executive Session