Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 9/17/2021 4:31:01 PM
Friday, September 17, 2021
Friday, September 17, 2021
Other
Anne Arundel County Redistricting Hearing
Change made: September 17, 2021 2:42 PM - HEARING ADDED
Anne Arundel County Redistricting Hearing - Other
September 30, 2021 6:00 PM to September 30, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Baltimore City Redistricting Hearing
Change made: September 17, 2021 2:51 PM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore City Redistricting Hearing - Other
October 12, 2021 6:00 PM to October 12, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Eastern Shore Redistricting Hearing
Change made: September 17, 2021 2:56 PM - HEARING ADDED
Eastern Shore Redistricting Hearing - Other
October 18, 2021 6:00 PM to October 18, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission
Change made: September 17, 2021 4:18 PM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
September 29, 2021 5:00 PM to September 29, 2021 7:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission-Western Maryland Redistricting Hearing
Change made: September 17, 2021 1:58 PM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission-Western Maryland Redistricting Hearing - Other
September 29, 2021 5:00 PM to September 29, 2021 7:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Southern Maryland Redistricting Hearing
Change made: September 17, 2021 3:19 PM - HEARING ADDED
Southern Maryland Redistricting Hearing - Other
October 28, 2021 6:00 PM to October 28, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Statewide Redistricting Hearing
Change made: September 17, 2021 2:45 PM - HEARING ADDED
Statewide Redistricting Hearing - Other
October 5, 2021 3:00 PM to October 5, 2021 5:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Change made: September 17, 2021 2:47 PM - HEARING ADDED
Statewide Redistricting Hearing - Other
October 15, 2021 3:00 PM to October 15, 2021 5:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Click to return on the top page