Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/30/2023 10:30:41 AM
Monday, January 30, 2023
Monday, January 30, 2023
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: January 30, 2023 9:44 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 14, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0213
Sen Ellis

Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing
SB0215
Sens Ellis and Augustine

Massage Therapy - Definition and Discipline
SB0216
Sens Ellis and Augustine

Massage Therapy - Definition and Reimbursement
SB0237
Sen Klausmeier

Public Health - Dental Services - Access
SB0255
Sen Hester

Public Health - Home- and Community-Based Services for Children and Youth
SB0278
Sen Waldstreicher

Perfusionists - Licensure Exemption - Employees and Agents of Federally Designated Organ Procurement Organizations

Change made: January 30, 2023 9:27 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 15, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0281
Sen Lam, et al

Commission on Public Health – Establishment
SB0307
Sen Klausmeier

Financial Institutions – Mortgage Loan Originators – Independent Contractors
SB0308
Sens Klausmeier and Hershey

Health Insurance – Utilization Review – Revisions

Change made: January 30, 2023 9:44 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 21, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0128
Sen Hester

Economic Development – Emergency Relief Program – Established
SB0136
Sen Klausmeier

Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Limitation and Methods
SB0331
Sen Hayes

Baltimore City – West North Avenue Development Authority – Membership and Procurement

Change made: January 30, 2023 9:44 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 24, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0304
Carroll County Senators

Carroll County – Alcoholic Beverages – Modification of Seating Requirements
ADDED: 9:27 AM
SB0306
Carroll County Senators

Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Event Entertainment Licenses
ADDED: 9:27 AM
SB0245
Sens Carozza and Mautz

Wicomico County - Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses - Issuance
ADDED: 9:44 AM

House
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee
Change made: January 30, 2023 9:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Briefing
February 10, 2023 11:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Judiciary Committee
Change made: January 30, 2023 10:09 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
January 31, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0097
Del Bartlett

Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Periods
REMOVED: 10:09 AM

Change made: January 30, 2023 10:09 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 14, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0097
Del Bartlett

Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Periods
ADDED: 10:09 AM

Click to return on the top page