Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/3/2023 12:47:54 PM
Friday, February 3, 2023
Friday, February 3, 2023
Senate
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: February 3, 2023 11:33 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
February 14, 2023 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0477
Sen Feldman

Residential Construction or Significant Renovation - Electric Vehicle Charging
ADDED: 11:33 AM

Change made: February 3, 2023 12:19 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
February 15, 2023 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0470
Sen Elfreth, et al

Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act)
ADDED: 11:33 AM
REMOVED: 12:19 PM
SB0517
Cecil County Senators

Port of Deposit State Historical Park - Included Areas
ADDED: 11:33 AM

Finance Committee
Change made: February 3, 2023 11:00 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 23, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0420
Sen Hettleman

Human Services – Temporary Cash Assistance – Housing Allowance
ADDED: 11:00 AM
SB0453
Sen Kramer, et al

State and Private Construction Contracts – Prompt Payment Requirements
ADDED: 11:00 AM

Change made: February 3, 2023 11:00 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 24, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0448
Sens Gile and Hester

Alcoholic Beverages – Manufacturer’s Licenses and Off–Site Permits
ADDED: 11:00 AM

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: February 3, 2023 9:55 AM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 28, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
HB0202
The Spkr (Admin)

Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2023

Education and Economic Development Subcommittee
Change made: February 3, 2023 9:29 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 6, 2023 1:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 6, 2023 3:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
University System of Maryland Overview

Change made: February 3, 2023 9:38 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 13, 2023 1:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 13, 2023 3:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
MSDE Early Childhood Development

Change made: February 3, 2023 9:41 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 20, 2023 1:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 20, 2023 3:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Accountability and Implementation Board
University of Maryland, College Park Campus
MHEC - Student Financial Assistance

Change made: February 3, 2023 9:41 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 27, 2023 1:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 27, 2023 3:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Maryland State Library Agency
University of Maryland Eastern Shore
Maryland Higher Education Commission
Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 3, 2023 11:04 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 9, 2023 3:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0611
Dels Kelly and Pena-Melnyk

State Board of Nursing – Sunset Extension, Licensure Exceptions, and Board Operations and Membership
ADDED: 11:04 AM

Change made: February 3, 2023 8:55 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 22, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0286
Del Shetty

Perfusionists – Licensure Exemption – Employees and Agents of Federally Designated Organ Procurement Organizations
REMOVED: 8:55 AM

Other
Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee
Change made: February 3, 2023 11:13 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee - Other
February 27, 2023 1:00 PM to February 27, 2023 3:00 PM
Webex-Teleconference
TBD

Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Board
Change made: February 3, 2023 8:55 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Board - Other
February 6, 2023 9:00 AM to February 6, 2023 10:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
General Meeting

Click to return on the top page