Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/27/2023 12:13:45 PM
Friday, January 27, 2023
Friday, January 27, 2023
House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: January 27, 2023 9:54 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Appropriations Committee - Budget Hearing
February 1, 2023 2:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 1, 2023 1:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Higher Education Overview
Maryland Department of Transportation Overview
DPSCS Overview

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: January 27, 2023 12:10 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
February 1, 2023 2:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 1, 2023 1:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
State of the Bay

Change made: January 27, 2023 12:11 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 1, 2023 3:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 1, 2023 1:00 PM)
(Previous Date/Time: February 1, 2023 2:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0011
Del Stewart

Private Well Safety Act of 2023
HB0030
Del Stein

Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Board, Fees, and Penalties
HB0032
Del Charkoudian

Maryland Food System Resiliency Council
HB0122
Del Bagnall

Wetlands and Waterways - Riparian Rights - Voluntary Registry and Notice

Change made: January 27, 2023 12:02 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 14, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0197
Chr Washington County Delegation

Washington County - Sheriff's Salary - Alteration
ADDED: 12:02 PM

Change made: January 27, 2023 12:05 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 15, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0310
Del Rosenberg

Environment and Energy - Investment in Communities With Low- to Moderate-Income Households
ADDED: 12:05 PM
HB0365
Del Lehman, et al

Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund
ADDED: 12:05 PM
HB0378
Del Love, et al

Natural Resources - Black Bear Conflict Reduction and Damage Reimbursement Fund - Uses
ADDED: 12:05 PM
HB0386
Del Jacobs, et al

Natural Resources - Blue and Flathead Catfish Finfish Trotline License - Establishment
ADDED: 12:05 PM
HB0389
Del T. Morgan, et al

Department of Agriculture - State Ombudsman for Value-Added Agriculture
ADDED: 12:05 PM

Change made: January 27, 2023 12:07 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 16, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0219
Del M. Morgan

St. Mary's County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts
HB0352
Del Stein, et al

Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
HB0353
Del Healey, et al

Traffic Control Device Monitoring Systems - Authorization
HB0367
Del Charkoudian

Vehicle Laws - Stop Sign Monitoring Systems - Authorization
HB0391
Del Healey, et al

Vehicle Laws - Parking Enforcement - Citations

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee
Change made: January 27, 2023 9:55 AM - HEARING ADDED
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Work Session
January 31, 2023 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB 214

Other
No. 4 - Baltimore County
Change made: January 27, 2023 11:34 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 4 - Baltimore County - Other
January 30, 2023 4:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Mr. Terry Hickey, Director, Baltimore County Department of Housing and Community Development will brief the Delegation on County Executive Johnny Olszewski's proposed package of foundational legislative reforms to expand access to new housing opportunities that address community concerns in Baltimore County.

Click to return on the top page