Update Report
As of: 5/29/2025 4:31:32 PM
Change made: May 29, 2025 10:19 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Briefing
June 24, 2025 10:00 AM
Site Visit
Informational briefing and tour of BWMC and Shock Trauma.
Change made: May 29, 2025 11:30 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
June 25, 2025 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
The Attorney General of the State of Maryland, Anthony G. Brown
Change made: May 29, 2025 4:25 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Aerospace and Technology Commission - Other
July 22, 2025 2:00 PM to July 22, 2025 4:00 PM
Genesis Engineering, 4501 Boston Way, Lanham, MD
The Maryland Aerospace and Technology Commission will meet to approve meeting minutes and discuss topics related to the aerospace industry in Maryland.
Change made: May 29, 2025 10:27 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee - Other
June 26, 2025 1:00 PM to June 26, 2025 3:00 PM
Webex-Teleconference
TBD
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools