Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/27/2023 5:20:16 PM
Friday, January 27, 2023
Friday, January 27, 2023
Senate
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: January 27, 2023 3:48 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
February 16, 2023 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0039
Sen Kagan

Ballot Access - Affiliating With a Party - Unaffiliated Voters
SB0089
Sen Carter

Elections - Ballot Questions - Publication of Proposed Laws
SB0111
Sen Kagan

Election Law - Campaign Finance - Draft Committees and Exploratory Committees
SB0132
Sen Jackson

State's Attorney, Clerk of the Circuit Court, Register of Wills, Sheriff, and Judge of the Orphans' Court - Nonpartisan Elections
SB0176
Sen Kagan

Election Law - Insufficient Number of Candidates for a Primary Election
SB0269
Sen Rosapepe, et al

Cryptocurrency - Campaign Finance Prohibitions - Disclosures by Financial Institutions
SB0287
Sen Gallion

State Board of Elections - Municipal Elections - Publication of Results on Website
SB0329
Sen Ready, et al

Election Law - Casting General Election Ballot in Multiple States - Prohibition

Finance Committee
Change made: January 27, 2023 3:19 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2023 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0002
Sen Hester

Department of Human Services - Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards - Fraud (Prevent Electronic Benefits Theft Act of 2023)
REMOVED: 3:19 PM

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: January 27, 2023 9:54 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Appropriations Committee - Budget Hearing
February 1, 2023 2:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 1, 2023 1:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Higher Education Overview
Maryland Department of Transportation Overview
DPSCS Overview

Economic Matters Committee
Change made: January 27, 2023 4:19 PM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
January 31, 2023 10:30 AM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Office of Policy Analysis

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: January 27, 2023 12:10 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
February 1, 2023 2:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 1, 2023 1:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
State of the Bay

Change made: January 27, 2023 12:11 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 1, 2023 3:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 1, 2023 1:00 PM)
(Previous Date/Time: February 1, 2023 2:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0011
Del Stewart

Private Well Safety Act of 2023
HB0030
Del Stein

Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Board, Fees, and Penalties
HB0032
Del Charkoudian

Maryland Food System Resiliency Council
HB0122
Del Bagnall

Wetlands and Waterways - Riparian Rights - Voluntary Registry and Notice

Change made: January 27, 2023 12:02 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 14, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0197
Chr Washington County Delegation

Washington County - Sheriff's Salary - Alteration
ADDED: 12:02 PM

Change made: January 27, 2023 12:05 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 15, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0310
Del Rosenberg

Environment and Energy - Investment in Communities With Low- to Moderate-Income Households
ADDED: 12:05 PM
HB0365
Del Lehman, et al

Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund
ADDED: 12:05 PM
HB0378
Del Love, et al

Natural Resources - Black Bear Conflict Reduction and Damage Reimbursement Fund - Uses
ADDED: 12:05 PM
HB0386
Del Jacobs, et al

Natural Resources - Blue and Flathead Catfish Finfish Trotline License - Establishment
ADDED: 12:05 PM
HB0389
Del T. Morgan, et al

Department of Agriculture - State Ombudsman for Value-Added Agriculture
ADDED: 12:05 PM

Change made: January 27, 2023 12:07 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 16, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0219
Del M. Morgan

St. Mary's County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts
HB0352
Del Stein, et al

Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
HB0353
Del Healey, et al

Traffic Control Device Monitoring Systems - Authorization
HB0367
Del Charkoudian

Vehicle Laws - Stop Sign Monitoring Systems - Authorization
HB0391
Del Healey, et al

Vehicle Laws - Parking Enforcement - Citations

Health and Social Services Subcommittee
Change made: January 27, 2023 2:35 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 1, 2023 4:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 1, 2023 3:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 150, Annapolis, MD
Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights
MD Institute Emergency Medical Services Systems

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee
Change made: January 27, 2023 9:55 AM - HEARING ADDED
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Work Session
January 31, 2023 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB 214

Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee
Change made: January 27, 2023 2:35 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 1, 2023 4:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 1, 2023 3:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
Maryland Tax Court
Board of Public Works
Executive Department - Governor
Secretary of State
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 27, 2023 12:35 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 1, 2023 2:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 1, 2023 1:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0069
Del R. Long

Education - Student Behavior - Parent and Guardian Notice and Required Counseling (Parent and Guardian Accountability Act)
HB0085
Del J. Lewis

Education - Collective Bargaining - Certificated Employees - Class Size
HB0099
Del Sample-Hughes

Education – Public High Schools – Financial Literacy Curriculum
HB0119
Del Atterbeary

Primary and Secondary Education - Comprehensive Health Education Framework - Established
HB0143
Del Qi

Career and Technical Education Committee - Alterations
HB0153
Del Wells

Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Student Members and Task Force to Study Compensation and Student Members
HB0175
Del Ebersole

Baltimore County Board of Education - Student Member - Voting
HB0185
Del Ebersole, et al

Nonpublic Schools and Child Care Providers - Corporal Punishment - Prohibition

Other
No. 4 - Baltimore County
Change made: January 27, 2023 11:34 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 4 - Baltimore County - Other
January 30, 2023 4:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Mr. Terry Hickey, Director, Baltimore County Department of Housing and Community Development will brief the Delegation on County Executive Johnny Olszewski's proposed package of foundational legislative reforms to expand access to new housing opportunities that address community concerns in Baltimore County.

Click to return on the top page