Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 12/1/2021 2:04:04 PM
Wednesday, December 1, 2021
Wednesday, December 1, 2021
Senate
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Change made: December 1, 2021 8:53 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Reapportionment and Redistricting - Bill Hearing
December 1, 2021 9:00 AM
(Previous Date/Time: December 1, 2021 8:17 PM)
(Previous Date/Time: December 1, 2021 8:40 AM)
(Previous Date/Time: December 1, 2021 8:50 AM)
Zoom / YouTube
SB2003
Sens Waldstreicher and Ready

OIS Test

Other
General Assembly Compensation Commission
Change made: December 1, 2021 1:15 PM - HEARING ADDED
General Assembly Compensation Commission - Other
January 3, 2022 2:00 PM
Location-TBD
Decisions
Review of Supplemental Materials

Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
Change made: December 1, 2021 11:54 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Other
December 7, 2021 1:00 PM to December 7, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Recommendations

Judicial Compensation Commission
Change made: December 1, 2021 10:58 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Compensation Commission - Other
December 13, 2021 1:00 PM to December 13, 2021 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Presentation of Compensation Materials.

Click to return on the top page