Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/31/2023 12:51:39 PM
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: January 31, 2023 9:34 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
January 31, 2023 2:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0032
Sen Brooks

Property Tax - Exemption for Dwellings of Disabled Veterans - Application
ADDED: 9:34 AM
SB0055
Sen West

Maryland Estate Tax - Portability - Time Period for Election
ADDED: 9:34 AM
SB0061
Sen Bailey

Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer
ADDED: 9:34 AM
SB0065
Sen West

Recordation Tax – Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of Trust – Extent of Exemption
ADDED: 9:34 AM
SB0070
Sen Kramer

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - State Law Enforcement Officers
ADDED: 9:34 AM
SB0141
Sens Elfreth and Zucker

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Adoption Expenses - Alterations
ADDED: 9:34 AM
SB0148
Sen Guzzone

Victim Services Programs - Supplementing Federal Funding and Support (Victim Services Stabilization Act)
ADDED: 9:34 AM
SB0152
Sen Augustine (JtCMPF)

Bond Sales - Notification of the Public
ADDED: 9:34 AM
SB0153
Sen Augustine (Chr JtCMPF)

State Investment Portfolio - Investment Thresholds - Alterations
ADDED: 9:34 AM
SB0174
Sens Guzzone and Salling

Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment Areas in Baltimore County - Sunset Extension
ADDED: 9:34 AM
SB0175
Sen Guzzone

Maryland School for the Blind - Public School Construction Program - Eligibility
ADDED: 9:34 AM
SB0205
Sen King

Education - Libraries - Funding
ADDED: 9:34 AM

Change made: January 31, 2023 9:53 AM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 16, 2023 8:30 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0264
Sen Jackson

Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Benefits

Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: January 31, 2023 8:43 AM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Appear
February 6, 2023 5:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

Change made: January 31, 2023 8:44 AM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Not Appear
February 6, 2023 5:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

Pensions Subcommittee
Change made: January 31, 2023 9:53 AM - HEARING ADDED
Pensions Subcommittee - Other
February 16, 2023 8:30 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

House
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee
Change made: January 31, 2023 12:20 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Briefing
February 10, 2023 11:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Judiciary Committee
Change made: January 31, 2023 9:50 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
February 1, 2023 1:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 1, 2023 1:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
- Access to Counsel in Evictions (ACE) Task Force; January 2023 Report

Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee
Change made: January 31, 2023 11:54 AM - HEARING ADDED
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Overview
February 7, 2023 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 31, 2023 9:38 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 9, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0455
Del Atterbeary, et al

Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Purse Dedication Account - Ocean Downs Race Course Operating Loss Assistance
ADDED: 9:38 AM

Change made: January 31, 2023 9:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 16, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0398
Del Feldmark

Economic Development Tax Credit Programs - Qualified Position and Qualified Employee - Definitions
HB0442
Del Tomlinson

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Broadband Grants
HB0445
Del Amprey

Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period - Winter Weather Shopping for Students
HB0471
Del Attar

Economic Development – Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program – Alterations and Financing
HB0479
Prince George's County Delegation

Economic Development – Independent Innovation Agency of Prince George’s County – Establishment PG 401–23
HB0486
Dels Attar and Stein

Income Tax - Credit for Student Bus Transportation Expenses
HB0493
Del Ruth, et al

Department of Commerce - Office of Climate Change Assistance for Small Businesses - Establishment

Other
Western Maryland
Change made: January 31, 2023 9:53 AM - HEARING ADDED
Western Maryland - Overview
February 2, 2023 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Washington County Delegation Meeting

Click to return on the top page