Update Report
As of: 3/23/2023 2:15:04 PM
Change made: March 23, 2023 2:00 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
March 24, 2023 10:00 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Change made: March 23, 2023 8:31 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
March 23, 2023 2:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Change made: March 23, 2023 12:07 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
March 23, 2023 3:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Change made: March 23, 2023 1:15 PM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
March 24, 2023 12:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Change made: March 23, 2023 10:40 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 29, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
SB0428
Washington County Senators
Washington County - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Deputies - Employment Conditions and Collective Bargaining
REMOVED: 10:40 AM
Change made: March 23, 2023 10:42 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 30, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
SB0442
Sen Corderman
Economic Development – Sports Entertainment Facilities – Financing and Construction
ADDED: 10:15 AM
SB0428
Washington County Senators
Washington County - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Deputies - Employment Conditions and Collective Bargaining
ADDED: 10:42 AM
Change made: March 23, 2023 11:33 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 30, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
SB0694
Sen Jennings
Department of Natural Resources' Real Property - Exchange With Private Real Property
ADDED: 11:33 AM
SB0830
Sen Hester
Environmental Health Specialists and Well and Septic Systems Permitting - Studies (Environmental Health Systems Support Act of 2023)
ADDED: 11:33 AM
Change made: March 23, 2023 12:52 PM - HEARING ADDED
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
March 29, 2023 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
SBs 514 and SB 910.
Change made: March 23, 2023 11:25 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
March 23, 2023 1:45 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 23, 2023 1:00 PM)
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
SB0003
Sen Augustine, et al
9–8–8 Trust Fund – Funding
SB0014
Sen Augustine
Health Occupations – Clinical and Graduate Alcohol and Drug Counselors – Licensure
SB0035
Sen Kagan
Open Meetings Act - State Ethics Commission (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act of 2023)
SB0101
Sen Augustine
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Collaborative Care Model Services – Implementation and Reimbursement Expansion
SB0112
Sen Kagan
State Finance and Procurement - Grants - Prompt Payment Requirement
SB0131
The Pres
Mandated Reports - Revisions
SB0168
Sen Guzzone
Maryland Developmental Disabilities Council - Establishment
SB0202
Sen Feldman
Prescription Drug Affordability Board - Upper Payment Limits
SB0215
Sens Ellis and Augustine
Massage Therapy - Discipline
SB0217
Sen McCray, et al
Transit - Commuter Bus Service - Procurement
SB0231
Sen Beidle, et al
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Autism Waiver - Military Families
SB0234
Sen Klausmeier, et al
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Hospital Rates - All-Payer Model Contract
SB0251
Sen M. Washington
State Government - Commission on LGBTQIA+ Affairs - Alterations
SB0256
Sen Hester, et al
Environment - Fire-Fighting Training - Oriented Strand Board - Prohibition
SB0332
Sen Hayes
Maryland African American Museum Corporation - Board of Directors - Membership
SB0334
Sen Hayes
State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Extension and Reports
SB0349
Sen M. Washington
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - License and Registration Issuance and Renewals - Electronic Means
SB0375
Sen Ellis
State Board of Physicians – Inactive and Emeritus Status
SB0386
Sens Hester and Bailey
Certified Local Farm and Fish Program - Establishment
SB0451
Sens Griffith and Hester
Procurement Improvement Council - Membership and Duties
SB0474
Sen Klausmeier
Managed Care Organizations - Retroactive Denial of Reimbursement - Information in Written Statement
SB0478
Sen Sydnor, et al
Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension
SB0498
Sens Hershey and Mautz
Rural Health Collaborative Pilot Repeal and Mid Shore Health Improvement Coalition Funding
SB0678
Sen Beidle
Health Insurance - Reimbursement for Services Rendered by a Pharmacist
SB0842
Sen Kramer, et al
Maryland Holocaust Remembrance Day
Change made: March 23, 2023 10:19 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
March 23, 2023 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Change made: March 23, 2023 11:31 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Baltimore County - Other
March 24, 2023 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing-U.S. Congressman Kweisi Mfume
Bill Hearing-SB0347
Change made: March 23, 2023 10:46 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
March 24, 2023 8:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Change made: March 23, 2023 12:54 PM - HEARING CANCELED
No. 6 - Montgomery County - Other
March 24, 2023 10:30 AM
State House Caucus Room, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD 21401
Voting Session
Change made: March 23, 2023 2:12 PM - HEARING ADDED
State Debt, Commission on - Other
April 18, 2023 2:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Annual meeting to recommend a State tax rate on real and personal property