Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 3/5/2021 2:59:07 PM
Friday, March 5, 2021
Friday, March 5, 2021
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: March 5, 2021 9:26 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Voting Session
March 5, 2021 9:45 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0139
Sens Carozza and Beidle

Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
SB0183
Sens Young and Rosapepe

Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact
SB0365
Sen McCray

Neighborhood Business Development Program - Food Desert Projects - Business Retention
SB0371
Sen Peters

Special Education - Individualized Education Programs - Educational Evaluations
SB0500
Sens Lam and Hettleman

Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
SB0516
Sen Klausmeier

State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Fees - General Fund
SB0517
Sen Klausmeier

State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Temporary Licenses to Practice Physical Therapy and Limited Physical Therapy
SB0525
Sen McCray

Baltimore City - Centralized Booking Facility - Voting Information and Early Voting Polling Place
SB0565
Sen Griffith, et al

Public Health - Data - Race and Ethnicity Information
SB0568
The Pres (Admin)

Health Care Practitioners – Telehealth – Out–of–State Health Care Practitioners
SB0571
The Pres (Admin)

Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
SB0632
Sen Kagan

Election Law – Contested Elections
SB0646
Sens Carozza and Kagan

Alcohol and Drug Counseling - Alcohol and Drug Trainees - Practice Through Telehealth
SB0650
Sen Klausmeier (Balt Co Admin)

Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility
SB0661
Sen Patterson

Environment - Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund - Funding, Reallocation, and Reimbursements
SB0673
Sen Gallion

Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
SB0687
Sen Smith

State and Local Housing Programs - Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing
SB0689
Sen Sydnor

Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Duties of the Special Secretary - Minority Business Enterprises
SB0692
Sen Young

State Planning – Preservation of Agricultural Land – Goal
SB0697
Sen Eckardt

State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Participation by Gender or Race
SB0703
Sen West

Procurement – Minority Business Enterprises – Qualification and Certification
SB0785
Sens Ferguson and Pinsky

State Board of Education Membership and Terms - Capability and Capacity Study of Education Agencies

Finance Committee
Change made: March 5, 2021 1:11 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
March 10, 2021 4:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 5, 2021 12:22 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
March 18, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0932
Sen Benson

Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Coverage – Acupuncture Services
SB0933
Sen Benson

Financial Regulation - Access to Banking and Financial Services - Reporting

House
Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: March 5, 2021 2:33 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 16, 2021 1:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB1285
Howard County Delegation

Howard County - Fee for Rental Housing Services - Established Ho. Co. 15-21
ADDED: 8:39 AM
HB0639
Del D.M. Davis

Tri–County Council for Southern Maryland – Property Management – Southern Maryland Regional Agricultural Center
ADDED: 2:33 PM
HB1010
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Low-Income Housing PG 415-21
ADDED: 2:33 PM

Housing and Real Property Subcommittee
Change made: March 5, 2021 10:33 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Work Session
March 9, 2021 3:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 9, 2021 12:30 PM)
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: March 5, 2021 9:15 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Work Session
March 10, 2021 12:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 10, 2021 5:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
Time of subcommittee meeting will be announced after Bill Hearings are complete.

Judiciary Committee
Change made: March 5, 2021 8:49 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
March 5, 2021 2:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0670
The Spkr (Plc Rfm Accntblty Wrkgrp)

Police Reform and Accountability Act of 2021

Change made: March 5, 2021 8:26 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
March 11, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0263
Del Wilson

Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations

Oversight Committee on Pensions
Change made: March 5, 2021 11:44 AM - HEARING ADDED
Oversight Committee on Pensions - Voting Session
March 11, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0922
Del Lierman (Chr Jt Com on Pnsns)

State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification
HB1336
Del Proctor

Alcohol and Tobacco Commission – Executive Director – Clarification

Oversight Committee on Personnel
Change made: March 5, 2021 10:49 AM - HEARING ADDED
Oversight Committee on Personnel - Voting Session
March 9, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0837
Del Carr

Collective Bargaining - Teachers at the Maryland School for the Deaf - Separate Bargaining Unit
HB0894
Del Haynes

Education – Community Colleges – Collective Bargaining
HB0904
Del Bridges

State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Access to New Employees

Other
Baltimore City
Change made: March 5, 2021 11:29 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Baltimore City - Other
March 8, 2021 12:30 PM
Zoom Meeting
Subcommittee discussion on HB1027: Baltimore City-Control of Police Department of Baltimore City.
REMOVED: 11:29 AM
Voting Session: HB1027-Baltimore City-Control of Police Department of Baltimore City.
ADDED: 11:29 AM

Harford
Change made: March 5, 2021 2:04 PM - HEARING ADDED
Harford - Other
March 11, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Weekly Harford County House Delegation Meeting

Click to return on the top page