Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Update Report

As of: 5/29/2025 3:27:23 PM
Thursday, May 29, 2025
Thursday, May 29, 2025
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: May 29, 2025 10:19 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Briefing
June 24, 2025 10:00 AM
Site Visit
Informational briefing and tour of BWMC and Shock Trauma.

House
Judiciary Committee
Change made: May 29, 2025 11:30 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
June 25, 2025 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
The Attorney General of the State of Maryland, Anthony G. Brown

Other
Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee
Change made: May 29, 2025 10:27 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee - Other
June 26, 2025 1:00 PM to June 26, 2025 3:00 PM
Webex-Teleconference
TBD

Click to return on the top page