Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 3/1/2024 10:22:00 AM
Friday, March 1, 2024
Friday, March 1, 2024
House
Economic Matters Committee
Change made: March 1, 2024 9:31 AM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Voting Session
March 1, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
HB0190
Del Hill

Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - First Responders
HB0253
Chr ECM (Maryland Cannabis Administration

Cannabis Reform - Alterations
HB0265
Del Qi

Insurance - Producer Licensing Requirements - Education and Experience
HB0323
Del Guyton

Environment - Commission on Climate Change Membership - Addition
HB0426
Del Bhandari

Places of Public Accommodation - Motion Picture Houses - Captioning
HB0518
Dels Taveras and Woods

Public Service Commission - Performance-Based Regulation - Study
HB0520
Del A. Johnson

State Real Estate Commission - Complaints - Advertising Violations
HB0554
Del Charkoudian

Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage
HB0584
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - First Responders (Caring for Public Employees in the Safety Professions - CAPES Act)
HB0602
The Spkr and Del Clippinger

Employment Discrimination – Sexual Orientation
HB0604
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Families Serve Act of 2024
HB0663
Del Ebersole

Alcoholic Beverage Tax - Ready-to-Drink Cocktails
HB0679
Del Jackson

Security Systems Technicians - Applicants - Authority to Practice
HB0702
Del Wilson

Wage and Hour Law - Minor League Baseball Players - Exemption
HB0738
Del Wims, et al

Business Regulation - Licensed Home Improvement Contractors - Liability Insurance
HB0749
Del Amprey

Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions
HB0847
Del Amprey

Alcoholic Beverages - Class A License - Food Retailers

Environment Subcommittee
Change made: March 1, 2024 9:56 AM - HEARING ADDED
Environment Subcommittee - Work Session
March 6, 2024 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Housing and Real Property Subcommittee
Change made: March 1, 2024 9:56 AM - HEARING ADDED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Work Session
March 6, 2024 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee
Change made: March 1, 2024 9:54 AM - HEARING ADDED
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - Work Session
March 5, 2024 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee
Change made: March 1, 2024 9:59 AM - HEARING ADDED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
March 7, 2024 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee
Change made: March 1, 2024 9:55 AM - HEARING ADDED
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Work Session
March 5, 2024 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Change made: March 1, 2024 9:14 AM - HEARING ADDED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
March 21, 2024 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Board Meeting

Click to return on the top page