Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 3/23/2023 11:13:49 AM
Thursday, March 23, 2023
Thursday, March 23, 2023
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: March 23, 2023 8:31 AM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
March 23, 2023 2:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: March 23, 2023 10:40 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 29, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
SB0428
Washington County Senators

Washington County - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Deputies - Employment Conditions and Collective Bargaining
REMOVED: 10:40 AM

Change made: March 23, 2023 10:42 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 30, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
SB0442
Sen Corderman

Economic Development – Sports Entertainment Facilities – Financing and Construction
ADDED: 10:15 AM
SB0428
Washington County Senators

Washington County - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Deputies - Employment Conditions and Collective Bargaining
ADDED: 10:42 AM

Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee
Change made: March 23, 2023 10:19 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
March 23, 2023 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Other
No. 11 - Baltimore City
Change made: March 23, 2023 10:46 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
March 24, 2023 8:00 AM
Virtual Meeting

Click to return on the top page