Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Senate Index

Calendar Date Legislative Date Proceedings Number
January 12, 2022 January 12, 2022 1 (Journalized)
January 13, 2022 January 13, 2022 2 (Journalized)
January 14, 2022 January 14, 2022 3 (Journalized)
January 17, 2022 January 17, 2022 4 (Journalized)
January 18, 2022 January 18, 2022 5 (Journalized)
January 19, 2022 January 19, 2022 6 (Journalized)
January 20, 2022 January 20, 2022 7 (Journalized)
January 21, 2022 January 21, 2022 8 (Journalized)
January 24, 2022 January 24, 2022 9
January 25, 2022 January 25, 2022 10
January 26, 2022 January 26, 2022 11
January 27, 2022 January 27, 2022 12
Proceedings
Calendar Date
January 12, 2022
Legislative Date
January 12, 2022
Proceedings Number
1 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 13, 2022
Legislative Date
January 13, 2022
Proceedings Number
2 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 14, 2022
Legislative Date
January 14, 2022
Proceedings Number
3 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 17, 2022
Legislative Date
January 17, 2022
Proceedings Number
4 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 18, 2022
Legislative Date
January 18, 2022
Proceedings Number
5 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 19, 2022
Legislative Date
January 19, 2022
Proceedings Number
6 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 20, 2022
Legislative Date
January 20, 2022
Proceedings Number
7 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 21, 2022
Legislative Date
January 21, 2022
Proceedings Number
8 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 24, 2022
Legislative Date
January 24, 2022
Proceedings Number
9
Calendar Date
January 25, 2022
Legislative Date
January 25, 2022
Proceedings Number
10
Calendar Date
January 26, 2022
Legislative Date
January 26, 2022
Proceedings Number
11
Calendar Date
January 27, 2022
Legislative Date
January 27, 2022
Proceedings Number
12
Last Updated: 1/27/2022 10:46 AM
Click to return on the top page