Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Fire Marshal - Reporting Requirements - Repeal
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - State Police)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that specified fire investigation reports about chimney fires be filed with the State Fire Marshal; repealing a requirement that the State Fire Marshal establish and maintain a repository of specified chimney fire reports; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/14/2016
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/14/2016 1/14/2016 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 25
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Second Reading Passed 25
House 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 27
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Finance 27
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed 56A
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
(   6-313, 6-314 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page