Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, R. Lewis, Crutchfield, Wilkins, and Williams
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 749
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State designated exchange to participate in a certain advisory committee, maintain a certain data set, and provide data under certain circumstances; authorizing the State designated exchange to use certain data to improve outcomes for patients; establishing the Maryland Commission on Health Equity to employ a health equity framework by taking a collaborative approach to improve health outcomes and reduce health inequities in the State and incorporating health considerations into broad-based decision making; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0052
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/03/2020
Legislative Date
8/03/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {576685/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-39)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-12)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 749
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/03/2020 8/03/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {576685/1 Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-39) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Finance 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (33-12) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Returned Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 749
(   13-4201 through 13-4207, 4-302.3   )
Last Updated: 6/2/2021 5:40 PM
Click to return on the top page