Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Living Organ Donors
Sponsored by
Delegates Busch, Kaiser, Turner, Afzali, D. Barnes, Buckel, Ebersole, Hixson, Hornberger, C. Howard, Long, Luedtke, Mosby, Patterson, Reilly, Rose, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Tarlau, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for up to $7,500 of qualified expenses paid or incurred by a living individual that are attributable to the donation of certain organs for organ transplantation; defining "organ" and "qualified expenses"; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Living Organ Donors
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {545564/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {323320/1 (Delegate Rey) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Living Organ Donors
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Living Organ Donors
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Living Organ Donors
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {545564/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Floor Amendment {323320/1 (Delegate Rey) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Living Organ Donors
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Text - Chapter - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Living Organ Donors
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page