Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - District Court Commissioners - Issuance of Arrest Warrant
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that only a police officer may file a statement of charges with a District Court commissioner; and altering a District Court commissioner's duties to exclude issuing arrest warrants.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - District Court Commissioners - Issuance of Arrest Warrant
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:25 PM
Click to return on the top page