Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing, from $4,500,000 in calendar year 2016 to $5,500,000 in calendar year 2017 and each calendar year thereafter, the maximum total amount of research and development tax credits that the Department of Commerce may approve in the specified calendar years; and applying the Act to all research and development tax credits certified after December 15, 2016.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0200
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0477 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {755468/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-30)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {755468/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (107-30) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Referred Rules 62 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-721 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page