Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Written Policies for Public Communications - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring each unit in the Executive Branch, on or before December 31, 2019, and every 4 years thereafter, to revise certain written policies for public communications, submit the revised policies to the Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review, and post the revised policies on the unit's website in a conspicuous place.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - Written Policies for Public Communications - Revisions
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   10-801, 10-802, 10-803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page