Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegates D. Barnes, Afzali, Brooks, Buckel, Carr, Chang, Ciliberti, Fennell, Folden, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Haynes, C. Howard, Knotts, Krimm, McConkey, McKay, Metzgar, Platt, Reznik, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Tarlau, Turner, Vogt, M. Washington, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "qualified Maryland biotechnology company" to extend a specified period of time from a specified date that an active business may claim the biotechnology tax credit; altering the definition of "biotechnology company" to include a company that will be primarily engaged in, or within 2 months will be primarily engaged in, specified activities; providing for the revocation of a specified tax credit certificate and the recapture of the tax credit under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0226
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1554 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-4)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {709236/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-6)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - Definition
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - Definition
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-4) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {709236/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (132-6) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - Definition
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Text - Chapter - Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - Definition
(   10-725 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page