Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation Protection Zones - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Gilchrist, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Lafferty, Lehman, R. Lewis, Love, Moon, and Stewart
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "SAV protection zone"; altering the requirements for the areas that must be included in updated designations of SAV protection zones; altering the circumstances under which a previously designated SAV protection zone may be opened to the use of a hydraulic clam dredge, traditional bottom dredge, or shinnecock rake; repealing the authority of the Department of Natural Resources to make certain revisions to the delineations of SAV protection zones; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation Protection Zones - Revisions
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   4-1006.1 )
Last Updated: 2/11/2020 9:08 AM
Click to return on the top page