Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Fees for Electronic Filings
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Anderton, Boteler, Buckel, Chisholm, Ghrist, Griffith, Hartman, Hornberger, Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Mangione, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Morgan, Munoz, Novotny, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, Thiam, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Eliminating filing fees paid by corporations and other business entities to the State Department of Assessments and Taxation for certain annual reports due on or after April 15, 2023, that are filed electronically.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0403
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Fees for Electronic Filings
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:16 PM
Click to return on the top page