Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Justice Reform
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 42
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Altering provisions of law relating to the jurisdiction of the juvenile court, the juvenile intake process, and the placement of a certain child in detention or community detention; altering provisions of law relating to the authority of the juvenile court in making a disposition on a certain petition; specifying the authority of the juvenile court to place a child on probation under certain circumstances; establishing the Commission on Juvenile Justice Reform and Emerging and Best Practices; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Justice Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {943825/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {123225/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (38-87)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Justice Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-38)
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {243826/1
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {243826/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-17)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-43)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Juvenile Justice Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 42
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Justice Reform
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juvenile Justice Reform
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {943825/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Floor Amendment {123225/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (38-87) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juvenile Justice Reform
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (93-38) 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 32AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments {243826/1 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Favorable with Amendments {243826/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Third Reading Passed (29-17) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (90-43) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Juvenile Justice Reform
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 42
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Justice Reform
(   9-3501, 9-3502 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:17 PM
Click to return on the top page