Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Jackson, Chang, Fennell, C. Howard, Knotts, J. Lewis, Lisanti, Proctor, K. Young, Angel, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland to study emerging communications technologies and develop a strategy for implementation of Next Generation 9-1-1 services across the State; authorizing the Emergency Number Systems Board to contract with a third-party contractor to provide staff for the Commission; requiring the Commission to report its final findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0285
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {816389/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Establishment
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {816389/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Establishment
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Text - Chapter - Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Establishment
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page