Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund - No Cost Licenses and Stamps
Sponsored by
Delegate Thiam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing an eligible sponsor organization providing recreational opportunities with grant funding from the Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund to provide at no cost an angler's license and trout stamps, a Chesapeake Bay and coastal sport fishing license, or a hunting license and any corresponding stamps to certain persons.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {980012/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources – Complimentary Angler’s License – Disabled Veterans
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments {980012/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund - No Cost Licenses and Stamps
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page