Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders - Probation and Suspended Sentence
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Dumais, Kittleman, McComas, Moon, Morales, Sanchez, Smith, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that, for purposes of provisions of law requiring a court to issue a permanent final protective order under specified circumstances against an individual who was convicted and sentenced to serve a specified term of imprisonment for specified crimes, a term of imprisonment includes any period of probation or portion of the sentence suspended.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
(   4-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page