Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Retail Service Stations – New Construction – Setbacks and Electric Charging Stations
Sponsored by
Delegates Ruth, Belcastro, Foley, Lehman, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing certain requirements for approval of construction of a new retail service station on or after October 1, 2022, including a setback requirement and the construction of a certain number of electric charging stations; and requiring approving bodies to adopt regulations to carry out the Act on or before January 1, 2023.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Retail Service Stations – New Construction – Setbacks and Electric Charging Stations
House 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page