Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employees and General Assembly Members - State-Owned Electric Vehicle Charging Stations - Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Fisher
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that a State employee who uses a certain State-owned electric charging station to charge a personal electric vehicle may not be subject to reimbursement; requiring members of the General Assembly who use a State-owned electric vehicle charging station to charge a personal electric vehicle to reimburse the State for the electricity used; declaring the intent of the General Assembly is to promote and facilitate the purchase and use of electric vehicles by State employees to the maximum extent feasible; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021, September 30, 2030
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2021
Legislative Date
2/07/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {260117/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {773729/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (47-80)
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-40)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2021 2/07/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Elected Officials – State–Owned Electric Vehicle Charging Stations – Reimbursement
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {260117/1 Adopted 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Floor Amendment {773729/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (47-80) 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Employees and General Assembly Members - State-Owned Electric Vehicle Charging Stations - Reimbursement
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (89-40) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Referred Rules 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 5:57 PM
Click to return on the top page